Boddie et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Claud E. Boddie, Jr. and Beverly Boddie
Defendant: Cedric Walker, Mary Haywood and State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00209
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Bolivar
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 05/15/2018. (rmw)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER OF CONTINUANCE. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 05/11/18. (rmw)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER dismissing 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/21/2017. (rmw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boddie et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claud E. Boddie, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Boddie
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedric Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?