The United States of America et al v. Delta Regional Medical Center

Plaintiff: The United States of America and Candi Sibley
Defendant: Delta Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2017cv00053
Filed: April 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 85 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/21/19. (tab)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 67 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 12/17/2018. (mga)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Requiring Government's Response. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 9/25/18. (tab)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/30/18. (bnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America et al v. Delta Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Feleica L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candi Sibley
Represented By: Lance L. Stevens
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moore
Represented By: Nicholas Francis Morisani
Represented By: William T. Siler, Jr.
Represented By: Frank W. Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?