Melton Properties, LLC et al v. Illinois Central Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Melton Properties, LLC, Floyd M. Melton, Jr., Floyd M. Melton, III, Moss B. Melton, McMillan Acres, Danny Hargett, Jane Hart McMillan Hargett and David Hargett
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company, Canadian National Railway, Union Tank Car Company, Inc. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2018cv00079
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
County: Leflore
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 126 Motion to Quash. Provided however, GHD shall have until July 14, 2020 to respond to the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/12/20. (bfg)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/27/2020. (irw)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Stay Discovery on Remediation-Related Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/3/2020. (bfg)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/8/20. (irw)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER LIFTING STAY re 82 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/15/19. (bfg)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/14/19. (tab)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/6/19. (jla)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/27/19. (bfg)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/13/19. (bfg)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying as moot 58 Motion to Compel. CNRC may refile its motion to dismiss within 21 days of the date of this Order. Any response to the motion to dismiss shall be due within 14 days of the filing of the motion and any reply shall be due 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/11/19. (bfg)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 57 Motion for relief from L.U.Civ.R 7(b)(2)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/11/18. (bfg)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying without prejudice 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/19/18. (tab)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/17/18. (bfg)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Discovery and finding as moot 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/19/18. (bfg)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/24/18. (bfg)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting, in part, the 20 Motion to Stay. The court will stay this case for the earlier of a 60-day period from the date of this Order or the completion of the Mississippi Commission on Environmental Quality's hearing on the Plaintiffs' claims regarding the Corrective Action Plan for Plaintiffs' property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/6/18. (bfg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton Properties, LLC et al v. Illinois Central Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melton Properties, LLC
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd M. Melton, Jr.
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd M. Melton, III
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moss B. Melton
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McMillan Acres
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Hargett
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Hart McMillan Hargett
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hargett
Represented By: Louis B. Lanoux
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Represented By: Glenn F. Beckham
Represented By: William Easom Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Tank Car Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Goggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?