KENNEDY v. GILLIS et al
Plaintiff: SOLOMAN STEVE KENNEDY
Defendant: Phil Bryant, Supt. Emmitt L. Sparkman, Roger Wruck, Pelicia Hall, Haley Barbour, Gloria Gillis, Kathy Taylor and Tamara Hall
Case Number: 4:2018cv00185
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 10/29/18. (cr)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy R. Percy. (cr)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-01810. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 7, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Mississippi, pursuant to Court Order entered 08/16/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/10/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Mississippi. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/5/2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/13/2018. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/10/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SOLOMON STEVE KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/10/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by SOLOMON STEVE KENNEDY.(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/10/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/24/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 9/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. GILLIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supt. Emmitt L. Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLOMAN STEVE KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?