Domingue v. Jantran, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marilyn Domingue
Defendant: Jantran, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00199
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Prediscovery Disclosure of Core Information by Thomas Bradford Janoush on behalf of Jantran, Inc.. (Janoush, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/13/18. (irw)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages by Jantran, Inc.. (Janoush, Thomas)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scotty Edward Chabert, Jr on behalf of Marilyn Domingue Jantran, Inc. served on 10/19/2018. (Chabert, Scotty)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jantran, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Marilyn Domingue. (Chabert, Scotty)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jantran, Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1604305, filed by Marilyn Domingue. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domingue v. Jantran, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jantran, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Bradford Janoush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Domingue
Represented By: Scotty Edward Chabert, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?