Cunningham v. East Tallahatchie School District

Plaintiff: Cora Cunningham
Defendant: East Tallahatchie School District
Case Number: 4:2019cv00010
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H. Watson, Jr on behalf of Cora Cunningham East Tallahatchie School District served on 1/18/2019. (Watson, Louis)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/20/2019. (irw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by East Tallahatchie School District. (Peeples, Timothy)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. East Tallahatchie School District answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/13/19. (ncb)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by East Tallahatchie School District. (Peeples, Timothy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Cora Cunningham (Norris, Robert)
January 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to East Tallahatchie School District. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1634060, filed by Cora Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B-EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. East Tallahatchie School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Tallahatchie School District
Represented By: Timothy Michael Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Cunningham
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?