Jackson v. Guaranty Bank & Trust Company

Appellee: Guaranty Bank & Trust Company
Appellant: Willie J. Jackson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00031
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 17 REBUTTAL to Motion re #16 MOTION to Strike #15 Brief filed by Willie J. Jackson. (tab)
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike #15 Brief by Guaranty Bank & Trust Company. (Atkinson, Boyd)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (tab)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #11 Order on Motion for TRO. (tab)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Willie J. Jackson (tab)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Letter/Correspondence from Willie Jackson. (tab)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for TRO. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/27/2019. (no document attached) (llw) Modified on 3/28/2019 (jla).
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for TRO and setting appeal briefing schedule. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/27/2019. (llw)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion for TRO. (jwr)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Willie J. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jwr)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers (jla)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/8/2019. (llw)
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Restraining Order by Willie J. Jackson. (jtm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record for Appellant by U.S. Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (ald)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Willie J. Jackson. (tab)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AGREED ORDER. Signed by Judge Selene D. Maddox on January 15, 2019. (ald)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING IN PART THE MOTION TO RECONSIDER. Signed by Judge Selene D. Maddox on February 15, 2019. (ald)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-01001-SDM. File received, filed by Willie J. Jackson. Appellant Brief due by 3/28/2019.(Attachments: #1 Certified copy of docket sheet)(ald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Guaranty Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Guaranty Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: Boyd P. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Willie J. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?