KENNEDY v. BRYANT et al
Plaintiff: Solomon S. Kennedy and Soloman S. Kennedy
Defendant: Phil Bryant, Haley Barbour and Roger Wruck
Case Number: 4:2019cv00072
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice - motions #2 , #10 are DENIED; motions #4 , #6 , #7 , #8 , #11 are DISMISSED as moot. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 6/4/19. (cr)
May 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. For chambers contact information please see the following web site. ** www.msnd.uscourts.gov/judges-information ** (cr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE. Case assigned to Judge Debra M. Brown and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Northern District of Mississippi. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Identification by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Termination of Officials Duties by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Grand Juries and Jury Verdicts by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Inadequated Badly Medical Cares by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Parole Expiration by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/03/2018. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HALEY BARBOUR, PHIL BRYANT, ROGER WRUCK with Jury Demand filed by SOLOMON S. KENNEDY. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]
September 11, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/11/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 5/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. BRYANT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon S. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soloman S. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?