McKinnis v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Dorris McKinnis
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00073
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. Parties announced the case had been settled. (irw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw) (Main Document 16 replaced on 6/28/2019) (irw).
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 RE-NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Dorris Mckinnis by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Virden, Britt) Modified on 6/27/2019 (tab).
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Dorris Mckinnis by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Virden, Britt)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/13/19. (irw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 12/19/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/19/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/18/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/18/2019. Daubert Motions due by 1/17/2020 and Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/11/19. (irw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 6/11/2019. (irw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Propounded to Defendant, Walmart Stores East, LP by Harry Merritt McCumber on behalf of Dorris McKinnis to Walmart Stores East, LP. (McCumber, Harry)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Harry Merritt McCumber on behalf of Dorris McKinnis to Walmart Stores East, LP. (McCumber, Harry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Britt Virden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff. (Virden, Britt)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 05/14/19. (irw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Virden, Britt)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - State Court Docket Page, #2 Exhibit "2" - Correspondence filing Complaint, #3 Exhibit "3" - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit "4" - State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit "5" - State Court Summons, #6 Exhibit "6" - State Court Fee Sheet, #7 Exhibit "7" - State Court - Notice to Clerk of Removal, #8 Exhibit "8" - State Court - Receipt of Notice of Removal, #9 Supplement "9" - State Court - Certification of File) (Virden, Britt)
May 8, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Dorris McKinnis. (tab)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Washington County Mississippi, case number 2019-0043C1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1676111) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Complaint) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinnis v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorris McKinnis
Represented By: Harry Merritt McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?