Sutton v. Allstate Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Mary Hankins Sutton
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00074
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. (irw)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court Unopposed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Boone, Levi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #2 Exhibit B Complaint 3 12 2019, #3 Exhibit C Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Complaint) 3 12 201, #4 Exhibit D Allstate Issued Summons 3 12 2019, #5 Exhibit E Letter of Assignment 3 19 2019, #6 Exhibit F General Order Setting Deadlines for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #7 Exhibit G General Order re Orders to be Approved by Attorneys for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #8 Exhibit H General Order re Non-Filing of Discovery Materials for the Eleventh Circuit Court District, #9 Exhibit I General Order re Local Rules, #10 Exhibit J Civil Cover Sheet 3 12 2019, #11 Exhibit K Correspondence from Attorney Boone dated 3 5 2019, #12 Exhibit L Attorney Jenessa Carter Hicks Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Allstate 3 29 2019, #13 Exhibit M Correspondence from Attorney Hicks dated 3 28 2019, #14 Exhibit N Amended Complaint 4 17 2019, #15 Exhibit O Allstate Policy (Ex. A to Amended Complaint) 4 17 2019, #16 Exhibit P Allstate Issued Summons 4 17 2019) (Stephenson, Robert)
June 7, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Stephenson, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss (Unopposed) and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Mary Hankins Sutton. (Boone, Levi)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Mary Hankins Sutton. (tab)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Bolvair County, Second Judicial District, case number 2019-0023. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1677602) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: David E. Stovall
Represented By: Robert R. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hankins Sutton
Represented By: Levi Boone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?