Coleman v. FDJ Trucking, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Pamela Coleman
Defendant: Chadrick Jones, John Does 1-10, Frederick Nichols, FDJ Trucking, LLC, Jeremy Rodgers and Danekins Rodgers
Case Number: 4:2019cv00078
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions by Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr on behalf of Chadrick Jones to Plaintiff. (Virden, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions by William R. Striebeck on behalf of Pamela Coleman to Defendant Chadrick Jones. (Striebeck, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories by William R. Striebeck on behalf of Pamela Coleman to Defendant Chadrick Jones. (Striebeck, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents by William R. Striebeck on behalf of Pamela Coleman to Both Defendants. (Striebeck, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Interrogatories to Defendant FDJ Trucking, LLC by William R. Striebeck on behalf of Pamela Coleman to Defendant FDJ Trucking, LLC. (Striebeck, William)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production by Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC to Plaintiff. (Virden, Gregory)
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC to Plaintiff. (Virden, Gregory)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/3/19. (rtc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for January 29, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (rtc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/13/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/13/2020. Motions due by 4/3/2020. Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2020 01:30 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (rtc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 7/2/2019. (rtc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by William R. Striebeck on behalf of Pamela Coleman to Defendants. (Striebeck, William)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones to Pamela Coleman, Personal Representative and Surviving Spouse of Robert E. Coleman, Deceased, Individually and as Personal Representative on Behalf of all Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Robert E. Coleman, Deceased. (Virden, Gregory)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John L. Davidson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davidson, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons to Chadrick Jones, #4 Exhibit Fee Bill, #5 Exhibit Attorney Check, #6 Exhibit Attorney Letter, #7 Exhibit Summons to Jeremy Rodgers, #8 Exhibit Summons to Danekins Rodgers, #9 Exhibit Summons to Frederick Nichols, #10 Exhibit Summons to FDJ Trucking, #11 Exhibit Attorney Letter, #12 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal) (Carlson, Mark)
May 31, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 State Court Record - Removal: Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 . (jwr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones, Frederick Nichols, Danekins Rodgers, Jeremy Rodgers. (Carlson, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Carlson, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/28/19. (rtc)
May 22, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (tab)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John B. MacNeill on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones (MacNeill, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones (Carlson, Mark)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark C. Carlson on behalf of FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones (Carlson, Mark)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against FDJ Trucking, LLC, John Does 1-10, Chadrick Jones, Frederick Nichols, Danekins Rodgers, Jeremy Rodgers, filed by Pamela Coleman. (tab)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones from Circuit Court of Washington County Mississippi, case number 2019-0055C1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1681610) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by FDJ Trucking, LLC, Chadrick Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons/Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. FDJ Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadrick Jones
Represented By: John B. MacNeill
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Nichols
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDJ Trucking, LLC
Represented By: John B. MacNeill
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Rodgers
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danekins Rodgers
Represented By: Mark C. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Coleman
Represented By: William R. Striebeck
Represented By: John L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?