Wren v. King et al
Plaintiff: Daryl L. Wren
Defendant: Officer Victor King, City of Greenville, Mississippi Police Department, John and Jane Does 1-10 and City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department
Case Number: 4:2019cv00088
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/1/19. (tab)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department, Victor King (Butler, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department answer due 8/17/2019; Victor King answer due 8/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/1/19. (ncb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department, Victor King. (Clark, Howard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward J. Bogen, Jr on behalf of Daryl L. Wren Victor King served on 6/17/2019. (Bogen, Edward)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward J. Bogen, Jr on behalf of Daryl L. Wren City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department served on 6/18/2019. (Bogen, Edward)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department, Victor King. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1687362, filed by Daryl L. Wren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wren v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl L. Wren
Represented By: J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob Bystrom Jordan
Represented By: Edward J. Bogen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Victor King
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greenville, Mississippi Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greenville, Mississippi, Police Department
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Howard David Clark, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?