Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Timberwood Logging, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Timberwood Logging, LLC and Alicia Alvarado
Case Number: 4:2019cv00100
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation against Timberwood Logging, LLC, and Alicia Alvarado. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 8/27/2019. (lpm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Timberwood Logging, LLC and Alicia Alvarado, Individuallly by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration in Support of Motion for Default Judgment) (Kidd, D.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alicia Alvarado, Timberwood Logging, LLC (jla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default) (Kidd, D.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation Alicia Alvarado served on 7/5/2019. (Kidd, D.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation Timberwood Logging, LLC served on 7/5/2019. (Kidd, D.)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alicia Alvarado, Timberwood Logging, LLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1695154, filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Installment Sale Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Second Installment Sale Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Third Installment Sale Contract, #4 Exhibit D - Fourth Installment Sale Contract, #5 Exhibit E - First Assignment, #6 Exhibit F - Second Assignment, #7 Exhibit G - Third Assignment, #8 Exhibit H - Fourth Assignment, #9 Exhibit I - First Guaranty, #10 Exhibit J - Second Guaranty, #11 Exhibit K - Third Guaranty, #12 Exhibit L - Fourth Guaranty, #13 Exhibit M - First UCC Statement, #14 Exhibit N - Second UCC Statement, #15 Exhibit O - Third UCC Statement, #16 Exhibit P - Fourth UCC Statement, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Timberwood Logging, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberwood Logging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?