Edwards v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Edwards
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. and John or Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2019cv00105
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Jacob Bystrom Jordan on behalf of Mark Edwards Notice of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Modine Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Subpoena Duces Tecum) (Jordan, Jacob)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/9/19. (rtc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER scheduling settlement conference for December 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/6/19. (rtc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/8/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/13/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/13/2020. Motions due by 3/27/2020. Settlement Conference set for 12/4/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/6/19. (rtc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 9/6/2019. (rtc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure of Core Information by Grover C. Monroe, II on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Monroe, Grover)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Jacob Bystrom Jordan on behalf of Mark Edwards to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Jordan, Jacob)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Edwards. (Jordan, Jacob)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Jordan, Jacob)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Dunbar, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr on behalf of Mark Edwards Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. served on 7/22/2019. (Tannehill, J.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/24/19. (rtc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grover C. Monroe, II on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Monroe, Grover)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C. Dunbar on behalf of Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Dunbar, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Mark Edwards. (Jordan, Jacob)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1698717, filed by Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/12/2019) (tab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Jacob Bystrom Jordan
Represented By: J. Rhea Tannehill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Dunbar
Represented By: Grover C. Monroe, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?