Betties v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tunisia Collins Betties
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Walmart, Inc. and Walmart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice for Defendant Walmart, Inc.. (Virden, Britt)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/13/19. (rtc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Merritt McCumber on behalf of Tunisia Collins Betties (McCumber, Harry)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for February 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/9/19. (rtc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 3/9/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/12/2009. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/9/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/9/2020. Motions due by 3/30/2020. Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/9/19. (rtc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2019. (Court Reporter digital.) (rtc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Harry Merritt McCumber on behalf of Tunisia Collins Betties to Britt Virdin. (McCumber, Harry)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Tunisia Collins Betties by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Virden, Britt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/9/19. (bds)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and/or Things to Plaintiff by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff. (Virden, Britt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories Propounded to Plaintiff by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff. (Virden, Britt)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Britt Virden on behalf of Walmart Stores East, LP to Plaintiff. (Virden, Britt)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Exhibit "4", #5 Exhibit "5", #6 Exhibit "6", #7 Exhibit "7", #8 Exhibit "8") (Virden, Britt)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/26/19. (rtc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Virden, Britt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Walmart, Inc.. (Virden, Britt)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Walmart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., filed by Tunisia Collins Betties. (tab)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Coahoma County, Mississippi, case number 14-CI-19-0043. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1702608) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Summons, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betties v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunisia Collins Betties
Represented By: Harry Merritt McCumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?