Burrell et al v. Concept Ag. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mrs. Monique Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Walter Jackson, David Allen Hall and Thomas Burrell
Defendant: Stine Seed, M.D. Kevin Cooper, B & B, Inc., Greg Crigler, Myron Stine, Concept Ag. LLC, Mr. Kevin Ryan, Agri Select LLC, Unknown Farmers And Planters and Unknown Stine Seed Breeders
Case Number: 4:2019cv00124
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 237 REPLY to Response to Motion re #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Transcript Excerpts) (Koury, Joseph)
March 11, 2020 Filing 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re #212 MOTION to Dismiss Pltfs' Amended Complaint filed by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Nelson, Jonathan)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #224 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/9/2020. (llw)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #226 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/9/2020. (llw)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER finding as moot #223 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. No further written order will issue. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 3/10/2020. (no document attached) (llw) Modified on 3/11/2020 (jla).
March 9, 2020 Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Concept AG and Greg Crigler filed by Greg Crigler. (Van Horn, Daniel)
March 6, 2020 Filing 232 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Address by Joseph Michael Koury on behalf of Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed (Koury, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 231 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #212 MOTION to Dismiss Proposed Order Submitted by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Nelson, Jonathan) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jla).
March 6, 2020 Filing 230 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calaf, Maria)
March 6, 2020 Filing 229 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #227 Response in Opposition to Motion, #228 Response in Opposition to Motion re #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Calaf, Maria) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jla).
March 4, 2020 Filing 228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #212 MOTION to Dismiss, #217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Trustee, International Trustee Group. (Turner, Van)
March 3, 2020 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #212 MOTION to Dismiss, #217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Robinson, Paul)
March 3, 2020 Filing 226 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #212 MOTION to Dismiss, #217 MOTION TO DISMIS (Unopposed) by Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Trustee, International Trustee Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Turner, Van)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying motions #90 and #122 for joinder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/28/20. (ncb)
February 25, 2020 Filing 224 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #212 MOTION to Dismiss; #24 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; re #217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; re #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Robinson, Paul) Modified on 2/26/2020 (jla).
February 24, 2020 Filing 223 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #212 MOTION to Dismiss, #217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Unopposed) by Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Trustee, International Trustee Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Turner, Van)
February 13, 2020 Filing 222 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler. (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 221 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler. (Slay, La'Toyia)
February 13, 2020 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Calaf, Maria)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/13/20. (ncb)
February 13, 2020 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Peel, Paul)
February 13, 2020 Filing 217 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Agri Select LLC. (Peel, Paul)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #216 Motion for leave to file amended motion to dismiss to replace the Motion to dismiss docketed at #83 . Leave to amend is limited to the filing of a motion and supporting memorandum that "correctly incorporate by reference and adopt" the amended motion to dismiss filed by the Stine Defendants. Movants must file their amended motion and supporting memorandum within 48 hours. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/13/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 12, 2020 Filing 216 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Dismiss by Crigler and by Concept Ag. LLC. (Van Horn, Daniel)
February 11, 2020 Filing 215 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Koury, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 Filing 214 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Myron Stine) (Koury, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #212 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Golwen, John) Modified on 2/11/2020 (jla).
February 11, 2020 Filing 212 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Golwen, John) Modified on 2/11/2020 (jla).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #199 Motion to deny as moot Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction #81 and for leave to file amended motion to dismiss to replace and supersede Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim #81 . Movant must separately file both the proposed amended motion and supporting memorandum, attached to the instant motion, within 48 hours. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #206 Motion to deem Motion to Dismiss #51 moot and to file amended motion to dismiss to replace and supersede Motion to Dismiss #80 . Movants must separately file both the proposed motion and memorandum, attached as exhibits to the instant motion, within 48 hours. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #196 Motion for leave to be excused from L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(b)(1) requirement with respect to CMC. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #198 Motion. The motion is granted with respect to the request to deem Motions #54 and #79 moot. The motion is denied with respect to the request to file an amended motion to replace Motion to Dismiss #83 because the proposed amendment incorporates a Motion #80 that has been terminated. Movants may file a renewed motion for leave to amend no later than 48 hours after the filing of the updated motion they wish to incorporate. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #194 Motion in view of entry of Text Order granting Motion #206 . No further order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #195 Motion to deny as moot Motion to Dismiss #52 and for leave to file an amended motion to replace and supersede the Motion to Dismiss #82 . Movants must separately file both the proposed motion and memorandum, attached as exhibits to the instant motion, within 48 hours. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/11/20. (ncb)(no document attached)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Substitute Party. The Clerk shall promptly make the appropriate change to the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/31/20. (ncb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 210 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #209 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by David Allen Hall. (Turner, Van)
January 16, 2020 Filing 209 MOTION to Substitute Party by David Allen Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Statement of Sylvia Ford Brown Chapter 13 Trustee for the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Tennessee, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order) (Turner, Van)
January 9, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Order by Van Davis Turner, Jr on behalf of David Allen Hall to Bankruptcy Trustee. (Turner, Van)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER finding as moot #197 Motion for Extension of Time. Within ten (10) days of this date, any party and/or the Bankruptcy Trustee may show cause why David Hall's claims should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute this action in the name of the real party in interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/7/20. (ncb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 206 MOTION re #51 Unopposed Motion to Deny as Moot the Motion to Dismiss by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint) (Calaf, Maria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 205 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference re #192 Notice of Conference. (irw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Calaf, Maria)
December 13, 2019 Filing 203 Supplement to Motion re #194 MOTION re #51 Unopposed Motion to Deny as Moot the Motion to Dismiss filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
December 12, 2019 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 12/12/2019. (irw)
December 11, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: #201 Status Conference RESET for 12/12/2019 at 03:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE: Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall is directed by the Court to notify the Bankruptcy Trustee regarding the 12/12/19 telephonic status conference and ensure her participation if at all possible. (ncb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 200 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #197 MOTION for Extension of Time . (Turner, Van)
December 9, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #197 MOTION for Extension of Time ; Please docket Memorandum in Support as a separate docket entry (jla)
December 6, 2019 Filing 199 First MOTION Unopposed Motion to Partially Deny as Moot Dkt 81 for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Leave to File Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Replace Dkt 81 by Agri Select LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Memo Motion to Dismiss) (Peel, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Filing 198 Consent MOTION to Deny as Moot the Motions to Dismiss Docketed at D.E. 54 and D.E. 79 and for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss to Replace the Motion to Dismiss Docketed at D.E. 83 by Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Concept AG and Crigler's Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Concept AG and Crigler's Memorandum in Support of its Amended Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim) (Slay, La'Toyia)
December 6, 2019 Filing 197 MOTION for Extension of Time by David Allen Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum) (Turner, Van)
December 6, 2019 Filing 196 First MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to be Excused from Local Rule 83.1(b)(1) re: lead counsel, Jonathan E. Nelson by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Golwen, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 195 First MOTION Unopposed Motion to Deny as Moot the Motion to Dismiss Dkt. 52 and for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss to Replace the Motion to Dismiss Dkt. 82 by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Amended MTD Pltfs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit B. Memo in Support of MTD Pltfs' Amended Complaint) (Golwen, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION re #51 Unopposed Motion to Deny as Moot the Motion to Dismiss by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Memorandum to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Koury, Joseph)
December 4, 2019 Filing 193 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul A. Robinson, Jr., by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Williams, Juan)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #193 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Paul A. Robinson, Jr. is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, and Walter Jackson. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by December 9, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/04/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
November 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul A. Robinson, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1742579); Please file Certificate of Good Standing from State Court (jla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. (irw)
November 21, 2019 Filing 191 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Paul A. Robinson, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1742579) by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Williams, Juan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 189 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Walter Jackson, Monique Jackson re #184 Notice of Conference. (jwr)
November 20, 2019 Filing 190 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 11/20/2019. (irw)
November 20, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan T. Williams on behalf of Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson (Williams, Juan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cameron Lacy Fields on behalf of Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler (Fields, Cameron)
November 18, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by La'Toyia Jenessa Slay on behalf of Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler (Slay, La'Toyia)
November 15, 2019 Filing 185 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Anthony A. Orlandi re #181 Amended Minutes, #179 Minutes. (jwr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 184 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 11/20/2019 11:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (bfg)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/12/19. (bfg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 182 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #175 Notice of Conference by Anthony A. Orlandi. (tab)
November 4, 2019 Filing 180 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Benjamin Andrew Gastel. (irw)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #172 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Benjamin A. Gastel is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of David Allen Hall and International Trustee Group. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by November 9, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/04/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
October 31, 2019 Filing 181 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 10/31/2019. (irw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 10/31/2019. (irw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 178 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Benjamin Andrew Gastel. (irw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 177 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr. (irw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference RESET for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
October 30, 2019 ORAL MOTION for local counsel to be excused from 10/31/19 status conference by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (ncb)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Oral Motion for Kevin Cooper's and B&B's local counsel to be excused from 10/31/19 status conference. No written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/30/19. (ncb)(no document attached)
October 29, 2019 Filing 175 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #168 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John D. Saba, Jr. is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Stine Seed Company, Myron Stine, and Kevin Ryan. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by October 29, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/24/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #171 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney J. Gerard Stranch, IV is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of David Allen Hall and International Trustee Group. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by October 28, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/23/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
October 21, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Anthony A. Orlandi by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Turner, Van)
October 21, 2019 Filing 172 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Benjamin A. Gastel,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1730777) by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Turner, Van)
October 21, 2019 Filing 171 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney J. Gerard Stranch, IV,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1730769) by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Turner, Van)
October 17, 2019 Filing 170 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr. (irw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 169 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr. (irw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 168 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney John D. Saba, Jr.,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1729896) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #167 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Maria Amelia Calaf is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, and Stine Seed. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by October 20, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/15/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
October 11, 2019 Filing 167 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Maria Amelia Calaf, by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION Retransfer Case and Proceed Pro Se filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
October 1, 2019 Filing 165 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #153 Order, #154 Status Conference by Katherine P. Chiarello, Jack A. Simms, Maria Amelia Calaf. (tab)
October 1, 2019 Filing 164 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #153 Order, #154 Status Conference by Anthony Orlando. (tab) (Main Document 164 replaced on 10/1/2019) (tab).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #161 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Henry Blake Talbot is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Agri Select LLC. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by October 6, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/01/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 30, 2019 Filing 163 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Atty. Benjamin Andrew Gastel. (irw)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #139 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion may be re-urged, attaching the required supplemental documents. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 26, 2019 Filing 162 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Atty. Jessica Ann Benton re #153 Order, #154 Minutes of Status Conference. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Filing 161 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Henry Blake Talbot,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1723034) by Agri Select LLC. (Peel, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #141 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jack A. Simms is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, and Stine Seed. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by September 29, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/24/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jessica Ann Benton is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, and Stine Seed. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by September 29, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/24/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #156 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katherine P. Chiarello is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, and Stine Seed. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by September 29, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/24/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 23, 2019 Filing 160 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Atty. J. Gerard Stranch, IV re #148 Notice of Status Conference, #149 Notice Continuing Case Management Conference, #150 Minutes of Status Conference. (jwr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 159 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Atty. Maria Amelia Calaf, Atty. Katherine Chiarello, and Atty. Jack A. Simms, Jr. re #148 Notice of Status Conference, #149 Notice Continuing Case Management Conference, #150 Minutes of Status Conference. (jwr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 158 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Atty. Michael Kapellas and Atty. Jonathan Edward Nelson re #148 Notice of Status Conference, #149 Notice Continuing Case Management Conference, #150 Minutes of Status Conference. (jwr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 157 EXHIBIT re #141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jack A. Simms, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Illinois Certificate) (Koury, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Katherine P. Chiarello,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1721203) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
September 20, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jessica Ann Benton,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1721201) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
September 19, 2019 Filing 154 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/19/2019. (irw)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Extending Time for Counsel to be Admitted to Practice before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/19/19. (ncb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 152 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT from attorney Jessica Ann Benton re #150 Telephone Conference, #148 Notice of Conference, #149 Notice Cancelling Conference. (jtm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 151 PRO SE MOTION to Retransfer Case and Proceed Pro Se by Thomas Burrell. (tab)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #143 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jonathan E. Nelson is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants B&B, Inc. and Kevin Cooper. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by September 18, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/13/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #144 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael P. Kapellas is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants B&B, Inc. and Kevin Cooper. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by September 18, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/13/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 12, 2019 Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/12/2019. (irw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE re #138 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. (irw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Counsel for Plaintiff David Allen Hall must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE by Van Davis Turner, Jr on behalf of David Allen Hall of Filing of Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Petition) (Turner, Van)
September 11, 2019 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cheyne Wright Harris on behalf of B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper (Harris, Cheyne)
September 10, 2019 Filing 144 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael P. Kapellas ; Attorney Michael P. Kapellas,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1717945) by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Golwen, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 143 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan E. Nelson ; Attorney Jonathan E. Nelson,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1717933) by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Golwen, John)
September 10, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Stone Golwen on behalf of B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper (Golwen, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jack A. Simms, by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 140 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jack A. Simms,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1717271) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Maria Amelia Calaf,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1717265) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #140 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re #141 . No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/9/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/29/19. (irw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 137 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Henry B. Talbot, Jonathan Edward Nelson, Michael Kapellas, Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr, Samuel Keenan Carter, J. Gerard Stranch, IV, Benjamin Andrew Gastel, Anthony A. Orlandi, Jessica Ann Benton, Jack A Simms, Jr, Maria Amelia Calaf, Katherine Chiarello. (jtm)
August 28, 2019 Filing 136 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-02265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Transferring Case sua sponte to the Northern District of Mississippi pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 8/23/19. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Ann Benton on behalf of Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed (Benton, Jessica) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 133 TRANSCRIPT RELEASE NOTICE: By Administrative Order 2008-35 the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee implemented a policy regarding remote access to electronic transcripts. Pursuant to that policy, as well as Civil Rule 5.2 and Criminal Rule 49.1, each party's attorney is required to review a transcript for information that should be redacted pursuant to the Judicial Conference's privacy policy which requires that Social Security numbers be redacted to show only the last four digits; birth dates should contain only the year of birth; individuals known to be minors should be referred to with initials; and financial account numbers should be redacted to the last four digits. Additionally, in criminal case files, home addresses should reveal only the city and state of residence.Our records indicate that the 90-day restriction on public access to an electronic transcript(s) in this matter will lapse within 10 days. If a redaction request is required but has not been filed, please do so immediately. Please feel free to contact our office for further guidance on this issue. Document #127: Release Date 4/22/2019. (cas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Stine Seed (Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 AMENDED MEDIATION ORDER signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/15/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting DE #128 Motion to Extend Deadline signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 3/15/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 129 STATUS REPORT Joint Mediation Report by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 128 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1-3-19, Proceedings before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.. Court Reporter Mark Dodson, Telephone number 901-525-2803. Tape Number: none. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 1/28/2019. Redaction Request due 2/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2019. (Dodson, Mark) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER on Mediatoin. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/03/2019. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2019. Both Parties present in Court. Court heard arguments from both Parties. Joinder issue has not been decided by the Court; The Court will look further into the question of jurisdiction; The Court sets a Mediation deadline for Friday, 03/15/2019 & the Court expects all Parties to mediate in good faith, Mediation Order to be entered. Further decisions will not be filed prior to the mediation deadline. (Plaintiff: Paul Robinson, Jr., J. Gerard Stranch, IV)(Defense: Maria Amelia Calaf; Daniel Warren Van Horn, Joseph Koury, Jack A. Sims, Jr., Katherine Chiarello, Michael Kapellas, Samuel Keenan Carter, Jonathan Edward Nelson, Henry Blake Talbot) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 124 Notice of Correction to #111 Reply to Response to Motion . (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 123 AFFIDAVIT re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crigler and by Greg Crigler. (Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION for Joinder of Rick Prowell by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit Prowell Declaration)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #103 Response in Opposition to Motion, #102 Response in Opposition to Motion, #101 Response in Opposition to Motion, #104 Response in Opposition to Motion OF JOE BRYANT, JR. FOR JOINDER AS PLAINTIFF filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 Response in Opposition to Motion OF JOE BRYANT, JR. FOR JOINDER AS PLAINTIFF filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Blake Talbot on behalf of Agri Select LLC (Talbot, Henry) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 118 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion Sur Reply to D.E. 83 filed by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 Response in Opposition to Motion Sur Reply D.E. 82 filed by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 Response in Opposition to Motion Sur Reply to D.E. 80 filed by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion Sur Reply to D.E. 79 filed by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion (Sur-Reply to D.E. 83) filed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 Response in Opposition to Motion (Sur-Reply to D.E. 82) filed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 Response in Opposition to Motion (Sur-Reply to D.E. 80) filed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion (Sur-Reply to D.E. 79) filed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group. (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting DE #105 Motion for Leave to File signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/03/2018. (Fowlkes, John). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony A. Orlandi on behalf of David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group (Orlandi, Anthony) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Andrew Gastel on behalf of David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group (Gastel, Benjamin) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Gerard Stranch, IV on behalf of David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group (Stranch, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
December 2, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #105 First MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply as to Opposition to Joinder update notice (Attachments: #1 Memorandum update)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 105 First MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply as to Opposition to Joinder by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant filed by Agri Select LLC. (Peel, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant filed by Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler. (Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant filed by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Nelson, Jonathan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Nelson, Jonathan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 99 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Concept Ag and filed by Greg Crigler. (Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Concept Ag and filed by Greg Crigler. (Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Support re #80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER STAYING CASE: until Motion to Dismiss has been ruled upon.. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/14/2018. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 95 SETTING LETTER: Re: #80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greg Crigler and, #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greg Crigler and, #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crigler and, #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant, #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants Kevin Cooper and B&B, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss. [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED]**** Motions Hearing set for 1/3/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 94 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Status Conference held on 11/14/2018. Both Parties present in Court. Response has been filed as to the Complaint; Replies will be filed as to Motions to Dismiss & Joinder, surreply by Plaintiff to be filed by 12/03/2018. The Court will Stay the case until pending Motion to Dismiss has been ruled upon. The Court sets all Pending Motions for Hearing on Thursday, 01/03/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Plaintiff: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.)(Defense: Maria Amelia Calaf, Paul C. Peel, Katherine Chiarello, Joseph Koury, Michael Kapellas, Samuel Keenan Carter, Daniel Warren Van Horn ) (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wrh) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #92 Notice (Other), #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant, #91 Notice (Other) Declaration of Joe Bryant (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant, #91 Notice (Other) Declaration of Joe Bryant (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson Declaration of Joe Bryant (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 90 First MOTION for Joinder of Joe Bryant by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crigler and, #83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greg Crigler and filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Stine Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 29, 2018 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT RELEASE NOTICE: By Administrative Order 2008-35 the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee implemented a policy regarding remote access to electronic transcripts. Pursuant to that policy, as well as Civil Rule 5.2 and Criminal Rule 49.1, each party's attorney is required to review a transcript for information that should be redacted pursuant to the Judicial Conference's privacy policy which requires that Social Security numbers be redacted to show only the last four digits; birth dates should contain only the year of birth; individuals known to be minors should be referred to with initials; and financial account numbers should be redacted to the last four digits. Additionally, in criminal case files, home addresses should reveal only the city and state of residence.Our records indicate that the 90-day restriction on public access to an electronic transcript(s) in this matter will lapse within 10 days. If a redaction request is required but has not been filed, please do so immediately. Please feel free to contact our office for further guidance on this issue. Document #65 : Release Date: 11/05/2018. (smm) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER ONLY - [NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Granting DE #78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/11/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greg Crigler and by Concept Ag. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nelson, Jonathan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Agri Select LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Peel, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Myron Stine, #3 Declaration of Kevin Ryan)(Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crigler and by Concept Ag. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit Concept Ag, #3 Affidavit Crigler)(Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting DE #76 Motion to Withdraw as to Attorney Annie Tauer Christoff signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 9/28/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney proposed order submitted by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Christoff, Annie) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Nelson on behalf of B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper (Nelson, Jonathan) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Acknowledgements missing pages 83-87 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits pages 45-50 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits pages 40-45 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits pages 31-39 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits pages 22-30 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits pages 11-21 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #66 Amended Complaint Exhibits Pages 1-10 (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 67 AMENDED COMPLAINT Rico Filing Statement against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 2, 2018, Scheduling Conference before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.. Court Reporter Lynn Dudley, Telephone number (901)525-1023. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/13/2018. Redaction Request due 8/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (Dudley, Lynn) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting DE #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and File Responses/Replies signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 8/2/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 63 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 11/14/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Status Conference held on 8/2/2018. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the Case. Plaintiff requested time to file an amended complaint. The Court grants Plaintiffs request to file an Amended Complaint, Amended Complaint filing deadline is Tuesday, 09/25/2018. Case set Wednesday, 11/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. for Scheduling Conference/Status Conference. (Plaintiff: Paul Robinson, Jr.)(Defense: Samuel Keenan Carter, Maria Amelia Calaf, Annie Tauer Christoff, Joseph Koury, Michael Kapllas, Katherine Chiarello-by phone) (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wrh) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greg Crigler and, #52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants Kevin Cooper and B&B, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation, #2 Memorandum In Support of Motion)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 60 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Text ORDER granting #58 Motion to Continue. For good cause shown, the Scheduling/Status Conference currently scheduled for 11:00 a.m. on August 2, 2018 shall be continued to 2:00 p.m. on August 2, 2018. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/24/2018. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (Pham, Tu) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Status Conference by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Keenan Carter on behalf of Concept Ag. LLC, Greg Crigler (Carter, Samuel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Text ORDER granting #50 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. For good cause shown, defendants Stine Seed Company, Myron Stine, Kevin Ryan, Kevin Cooper, and B&B, Inc., shall file an answer to plaintiffs' complaint within fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on their Partial Motion to Dismiss. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/13/2018. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (Pham, Tu) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 55 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(pyb) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greg Crigler and by Concept Ag. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit Concept AG, #3 Affidavit Crigler)(Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Agri Select LLC.(Peel, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants Kevin Cooper and B&B, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss by B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Kevin Cooper and B&B, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Christoff, Annie) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Myron Stine, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Kevin Ryan)(Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting DE #48 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/27/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell as to Greg Crigler. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 46 Notice of Correction to #44 Summons Returned Executed Correct Attachment to item 44 Greg Crigler Summons Returned Executed. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell as to Concept Ag. LLC. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell as to Greg Crigler. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting DE #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/11/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting DE #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/11/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Agri Select LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Peel, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Peel on behalf of Agri Select LLC (Peel, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to Myron Stine. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to Stine Seed. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to Kevin Cooper. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to B & B, Inc.. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to Kevin Ryan. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 9, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Hall, Walter Jackson, International Trustee Group, Tyrone Grayer, Thomas Burrell, Monique Jackson as to Agri Select LLC. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting DE #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/7/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting DE #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/7/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting DE #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/7/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 29 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint Revised Missing Pages 43-47. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 28 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #24 Notice of Correction has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Wet signature. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Effectiveness of Electronic Signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2804816) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Chiarello, Katherine) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2804814) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Calaf, Maria) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2804812) by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Simms, Jack) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint missing pages (43-47) added. (Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting DE #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 5/25/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Proposed Order Submitted by Concept Ag. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Warren Van Horn on behalf of Concept Ag. LLC (Van Horn, Daniel) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kapellas on behalf of B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper (Kapellas, Michael) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Annie Tauer Christoff on behalf of B & B, Inc., Kevin Cooper (Christoff, Annie) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting DE #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond as to all Defendants Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 5/16/18. (Fowlkes, John) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Proposed Order Submitted by Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed. (Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Koury on behalf of Kevin Ryan, Myron Stine, Stine Seed (Koury, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Agri Select LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to B & B, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Concept Ag. LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Greg Crigler. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Kevin Cooper. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kevin Ryan. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Myron Stine. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Stine Seed. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons by Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 3 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Thomas Burrell, Tyrone Grayer, David Allen Hall, International Trustee Group, Monique Jackson, Walter Jackson re #1 Complaint Exhibits to Complaint 2-4 Splits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Split, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Split)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2770429), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Split One)(Robinson, Paul) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 8/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrell et al v. Concept Ag. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Monique Jackson
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Trustee Group
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Grayer
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jackson
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Hall
Represented By: Anthony A. Orlandi
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Burrell
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stine Seed
Represented By: Joseph Michael Koury
Represented By: Jessica Ann Benton
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Jack A Simms, Jr
Represented By: Katherine Chiarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Kevin Cooper
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Nelson
Represented By: Michael Kapellas
Represented By: Annie T. Christoff
Represented By: Cheyne Wright Harris
Represented By: John Stone Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & B, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Nelson
Represented By: Michael Kapellas
Represented By: Annie T. Christoff
Represented By: Cheyne Wright Harris
Represented By: John Stone Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Crigler
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Stine
Represented By: Joseph Michael Koury
Represented By: Jessica Ann Benton
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Jack A Simms, Jr
Represented By: Katherine Chiarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concept Ag. LLC
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kevin Ryan
Represented By: Joseph Michael Koury
Represented By: Jessica Ann Benton
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Represented By: Jack A Simms, Jr
Represented By: Katherine Chiarello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Select LLC
Represented By: Henry B. Talbot
Represented By: Paul Christopher Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Farmers And Planters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stine Seed Breeders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?