Tedder v. Banks et al
Plaintiff: William Phillip Tedder
Defendant: Warden Wendell Banks, Officer Gary, Captain Edwards and Officer Foster
Case Number: 4:2019cv00128
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Glen H Davidson
2 Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Discovery by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; counting as a STRIKE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/7/19. (jla)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/7/19. (jla)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/4/19. (jla)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/4/19. (jla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE of INTENT to Continue Lawsuit. (jla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. District Judge Debra M. Brown no longer assigned to the case. (jla)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 9/30/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/19. (jla)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by William Phillip Tedder. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedder v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Wendell Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Phillip Tedder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?