Hubbert v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Hubbert
Defendant: COTV, Marshal Turner, Lt. Ecko Roberts and Timothy Morris
Case Number: 4:2019cv00137
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/7/19. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT and Notice of Intent to Continue Lawsuit. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Timothy Hubbert. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jla)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 10/17/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/19. (jla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Hubbert. (jla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Timothy Hubbert. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbert v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COTV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshal Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Ecko Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Hubbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?