Sims v. Coahoma County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: Jason M. Sims, Sr.
Defendant: Coahoma County, Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2019cv00145
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Coahoma County, Mississippi OF INTENT OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Duces Tecum) (Griffith, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/15/19. (irw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED #7 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Coahoma County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel) Modified on 11/15/2019 (tab).
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Coahoma County, Mississippi. (Griffith, Daniel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Coahoma County, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian G. McEntire on behalf of Jason M. Sims, Sr (McEntire, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Luke Benedict on behalf of Jason M. Sims, Sr Coahoma County, Mississippi served on 10/24/2019. (Benedict, Joseph)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Coahoma County, Mississippi. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Remark: Letter of Introduction on behalf of attorney Brian G. McEntire on behalf of Jason M. Sims, Sr. (jtm)
September 30, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Jason M. Sims, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Coahoma County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason M. Sims, Sr.
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Represented By: Brian G. McEntire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coahoma County, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?