Cruse v. Banks et al
Petitioner: Andrew C. Cruse, Jr.
Respondent: Warden Wendel Banks and Attorney General State of Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2019cv00163
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew C. Cruse, Jr. (jla)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andrew C. Cruse, Jr. (jla)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andrew C. Cruse, Jr. (jla)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order. (jla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 Notice of Assignment. (jla)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #1 Order. (jla)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring the petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/18/19. (jla)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER SEALING DOCUMENTS. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/7/2019. (lpm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Harrison County), filed by Andrew C. Cruse, Jr. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruse v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew C. Cruse, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Wendel Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?