Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP et al v. Evans
Plaintiff: Antonio Riley, Charles Hampton, Ruth Robbins, Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP and Sharon N. Young
Defendant: Doug Evans
Case Number: 4:2019cv00167
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE re #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/2/20. (bfg)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 2/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/30/2019. (jtm)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young. (Craig, James)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alterrnaive, Abstention filed by Doug Evans. (Miracle, Douglas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Doug Evans. (Miracle, Douglas)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas T. Miracle on behalf of Doug Evans (Miracle, Douglas)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Kemmitt on behalf of Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Antonio Riley, Charles Hampton, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young Doug Evans served on 12/3/2019. (Kemmitt, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Emily Mottiel Washington is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of The Attala County Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, and Sharon Young. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by December 8, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/03/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Emily Mottiel Washington,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1744297) by Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young. (Attachments: #1 Att A: Client List, #2 Att B: Cert of Good Standing) (Craig, James)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Doug Evans. Returned to attorney for service. (jwr)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Kemmitt is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Attala County Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, and Sharon Young. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by November 25, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/20/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Liliana Zaragoza is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Attala County Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, and Sharon Young. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by November 24, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/19/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Christopher Kemmitt,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1740599) by Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young. (Attachments: #1 Att A: Client List, #2 Att B: Court Admissions, #3 Kemmitt DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Kemmitt NY Certificate of Good Standing) (Craig, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Liliana Zaragoza,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1740593) by Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Charles Hampton, Antonio Riley, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young. (Attachments: #1 App A: Client List, #2 LZ Cerificate of Good Standing) (Craig, James)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1740317, filed by Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP, Antonio Riley, Charles Hampton, Ruth Robbins, Sharon N. Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (tab)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP et al v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Evans
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Riley
Represented By: James W. Craig
Represented By: Christopher Kemmitt
Represented By: Emily Mottiel Washington
Represented By: Liliana Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hampton
Represented By: James W. Craig
Represented By: Christopher Kemmitt
Represented By: Emily Mottiel Washington
Represented By: Liliana Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Robbins
Represented By: James W. Craig
Represented By: Christopher Kemmitt
Represented By: Emily Mottiel Washington
Represented By: Liliana Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attala County, Mississippi Branch of the NAACP
Represented By: James W. Craig
Represented By: Christopher Kemmitt
Represented By: Emily Mottiel Washington
Represented By: Liliana Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon N. Young
Represented By: James W. Craig
Represented By: Christopher Kemmitt
Represented By: Emily Mottiel Washington
Represented By: Liliana Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?