Krystal Commerce, LLC v. The Krystal Company
Plaintiff: Krystal Commerce, LLC
Defendant: The Krystal Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00192
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
2 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE DUE TO BANKRUPTCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/3/20. (bnd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hathaway, Bradley)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Krystal Company (jla)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Entry of Default by Krystal Commerce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hathaway, Bradley)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bradley Farel Hathaway on behalf of Krystal Commerce, LLC Krystal Commerce, LLC served on 12/24/2019. (Hathaway, Bradley)
December 26, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Krystal Company. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1753601, filed by Krystal Commerce, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit C Letter Dated 12/10/19, #4 Exhibit D Letter Dated 12/17/19, #5 Exhibit E Analysis of Lease, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krystal Commerce, LLC v. The Krystal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Commerce, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Represented By: Brittany Brooks Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Krystal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?