Franklin v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Plaintiff: Annette Franklin
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00090
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/20/2020. (rtc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/9/20. (bnd)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/11/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/9/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/9/2020. Motions due by 2/1/2021. Settlement Conference set for 9/29/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/9/20. (bnd)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 7/9/2020. (bnd)
July 8, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Auerswald, Charles)
June 30, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jla)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Dolgencorp, LLC , filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Auerswald, Charles)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/23/2020. (rtc)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Dolgencorp, LLC ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Auerswald, Charles) Modified on 6/11/2020 (jla).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/2/2020. (rtc)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dolgencorp, LLC, filed by Annette Franklin. (tab)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dolgencorp, LLC from Circuit Court of Coahoma County, Mississippi, case number 14-CI-2020-002. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1811913) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Dolgencorp, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Dolgencorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp, LLC
Represented By: Charles Cameron Auerswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Franklin
Represented By: Derek D. Hopson
Represented By: Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?