Harris v. Saul
Plaintiff: Orlando Harris
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00136
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Andrew Saul answer due 10/26/2020. (jla)
September 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Orlando Harris Andrew Saul served on 8/31/2020. (Reynolds, Thomas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Orlando Harris Andrew Saul served on 8/26/2020. (Reynolds, Thomas)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 20, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number MSN300026404 (jwr)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/5/20. (ncb)
August 3, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Orlando Harris. (jla)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Orlando Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Harris
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?