Gregory v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gregory
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., John Does 1-10, Sergio Spencer, XYZ Corp 1-10 and Savant Harris
Case Number: 4:2020cv00143
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE re #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/17/20. (bfg)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND filed by Kenneth Gregory. (Yates, Shanda)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Re: Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Savant Harris, Sergio Spencer, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3") (Virden, Britt)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Civil.Cover.Sheet, #2 Exhibit "2" Complaint, #3 Exhibit "3" Summons Walmart, #4 Exhibit "4" Summons Harris, #5 Exhibit "5" Summons Spencer, #6 Exhibit "6" Proof of Service Walmart, #7 Exhibit "7" Proof of Service Harris, #8 Exhibit "8" Proof of Service Spencer, #9 Exhibit "9" Notice to Circuit Clerk of Removal, #10 Exhibit "10" Receipt of Notice of Removal) (Virden, Britt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kenneth Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE COURT COMPLAINT_EX A) (Yates, Shanda)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shanda M Yates on behalf of Kenneth Gregory (Yates, Shanda)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint Re: Answer of Defendants Savant Harris and Sergio Spencer by Savant Harris, Sergio Spencer. (Virden, Britt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, . (Virden, Britt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Virden, Britt)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Gregory. (jla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Sergio Spencer, Savant Harris from Circuit Court of Sunflower County, case number 2020-0303. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1840355) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Sergio Spencer, Savant Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gregory
Represented By: Yancy Brian Burns
Represented By: Shanda M Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Spencer
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savant Harris
Represented By: Britt Virden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?