Mosby v. King et al
Defendant: TD Auto Finance LLC formerly known as DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge doing business as ReMarketing Edge, Jehlani King, AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, Huntington National Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association formerly known as Wells Fargo Dealer Services doing business as Wells Fargo Auto, Fedex Exmployees Credit Union, Cingular Wireless Employee Services, LLC, American Express Company, Okpala Manneh, DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge, Capital One National Association, Trantor Management, Inc. doing business as Trantor Atlantic Lofts, Synchrony Financial, John Doe Individuals, DCFS USA LLC, Huntington Bancshares Incorporated, Wells Fargo Dealer Services, Carmax Business Services, LLC doing business as CarMax Auto Finance, Wayfair, LLC, Bank of America Corporation, John Doe Corporations, Unifi Equipment Finance, Bank of America, N.A. and Fedex Employees Credit Union
Counter Claimant: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC and FedEx Employees Credit Association Federal Credit Union
Counter Defendant: Ashley Mosby
Case Number: 4:2020cv00149
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for August 30, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (def)
August 26, 2021 Filing 95 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing) (Hopson, Derek)
August 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and AdministrativeProcedures Section 3(A)(8) states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Court staff has made the correction; Attorney will be directed to refile in the future. (jla)
August 17, 2021 Filing 94 CORPORATE STATEMENT of FedEx Employees Credit Union (Robinson, Brittan) Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla). Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla).
August 17, 2021 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #92 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Robinson, Brittan)
August 17, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment by FedEx Employees Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Visa Charge Card, #2 Exhibit B - Visa Consumer Agreement and Disclosure Form, #3 Exhibit C - Monthly Statements for Charge Card Account) (Robinson, Brittan) Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla). Modified on 8/18/2021 (jla).
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and the parties' Confidential Settlement Memos are due no later than 8/16/2021. ***PLEASE READ THE INITIAL ORDER CAREFULLY AS IT CONTAINS IMPORTANT INFORMATION RELATED TO THE SUBMISSION OF THE PROPOSED CMO AND THE CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMOS*** Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/26/2021. (jf)
April 21, 2021 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION for Entry of Default (by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC to the Clerk) filed by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
April 21, 2021 Filing 89 ANSWER to #80 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim against Ashley Mosby by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
April 21, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Attorney to file affidavit in support of request as required by F.R.Civ.P.55(a) re #88 MOTION for Entry of Default (tab)
April 20, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION for Entry of Default by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
March 24, 2021 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Jehlani King, Trantor Management, Inc., and Bank of America Corporation (jla)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/22/2021. (jwr)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/22/2021. (jwr)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/22/2021. (jwr)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/22/2021. (jwr)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/22/2021. (jwr)
February 19, 2021 Filing 81 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Jehlani King and Trantor Management, Inc. (jla)
February 9, 2021 Filing 80 COUNTERCLAIM against Ashley Mosby by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Bumgarner, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER of Dismissal; Bank of America, N.A. dismissed with prejudice, Bank of America, N.A. terminated.. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/9/2020. (jla) (Main Document 79 replaced on 2/10/2021) (jla).
February 5, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby, Ashley Mosby, Ashley Mosby re #77 Notice of Settlement & Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Bank of America (Hopson, Derek)
February 5, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Settlement by Stephen T. Masley on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Masley, Stephen)
January 13, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby Of Voluntary Dismissal As to Defendant American Express (Hopson, Derek)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Bank of America, NA shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint not later than February, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/13/21. (def)
January 12, 2021 Filing 74 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Jehlani King and Trantor Management, Inc. (jla)
January 12, 2021 Filing 73 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to American Express Company (jla)
January 6, 2021 Filing 72 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Masley, Stephen)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #60 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response is due January 6, 2021. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 21/11/2020. No document attached. (def) Modified on 12/11/2020 (jla).
December 11, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Bank of America, N.A. answer due 1/6/2021. (jla)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS of Wells Fargo Bank ; granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC; granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #39 MOTION TO DISMISS of Synchrony Financial; granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #53 MOTION to Dismiss of TD Auto Finance, LLC. Responses to [32, 35, 39, and 53] due on or before 12/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/10/20. (ab)
December 9, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
December 9, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
December 9, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
December 9, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 12/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/9/20. (ab)
December 9, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #58 Memorandum in Support, #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
December 7, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Settlement (Conditional) by R. Frank Springfield on behalf of Carmax Business Services, LLC (Springfield, R.)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One National Association terminated.. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/7/20. (jla)
December 4, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby, Ashley Mosby, Ashley Mosby of Voluntary Dismissal of Capital One (Hopson, Derek)
December 4, 2020 Filing 60 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Masley, Stephen)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Express Company answer due 12/8/2020. No further written order shall issue from the court. No document attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/4/20. (def) Modified on 12/4/2020 (jla).
November 30, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Burton, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Burton, Elizabeth)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Capital One National Association answer due 12/8/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/29/20. (def)
November 24, 2020 Filing 55 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Capital One National Association. (Beckett, Patrick)
November 20, 2020 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #53 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TD Auto Finance LLC. (Hembree, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss by TD Auto Finance LLC. (Hembree, George)
November 20, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Defendant, TD Auto Finance, LLC. (Hembree, George)
November 19, 2020 Filing 51 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Bey, Sheryl)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Capital One National Association answer due 11/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/18/20. (def)
November 13, 2020 Filing 49 CORPORATE STATEMENT The Huntington National Bank. (Burton, Elizabeth)
November 10, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Capital One National Association. (Beckett, Patrick)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or other response to the complaint. Response to be filed not later than December 7. 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/10/20. (def)
November 9, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by American Express Company. (Keup, Morgan)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER dismissing Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/5/2020. (jwr)
November 5, 2020 Filing 44 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Masley, Stephen)
November 5, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION of Dismissal . (Dorsey, Brandon)
November 4, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Bumgarner, Stephen)
November 4, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Hembree, George)
November 4, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Synchrony Financial. (Hembree, George)
November 4, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Synchrony Financial. (Hembree, George)
November 3, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon I. Dorsey on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLC (Dorsey, Brandon)
November 2, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Bumgarner, Stephen)
November 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION ACTION REQUIRED Document filed incorrectly as a motion instead of memorandum in support; re-file using event memorandum in support list under Other Documents on the civil events menu re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (tab)
October 30, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
October 30, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Bumgarner, Stephen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby Of Voluntary Dismissal As to Defendant Wayfair LLC (Hopson, Derek)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Bey, Sheryl)
October 26, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Escalade Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Executed Bentley Contract) (Bey, Sheryl)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Capital One National Association answer due 11/10/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/20. (def)
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen J. Bumgarner on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC (Bumgarner, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC answer due 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/15/20. (def)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Parrott, Evan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 COUNTER-DEFENDANT MOSBY'S ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim THE HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 COUNTER-DEFENDANT MOSBY'S ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim FEDEX EMPLOYEES CREDIT ASSOC FED CREDIT UNION by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
October 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan McPhail Keup on behalf of American Express Company (Keup, Morgan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Ashley Mosby (as to #10 COUNTERCLAIM; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Express Company answer due 11/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/14/20. (def)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by La'Toyia Jenessa Slay on behalf of Capital One National Association (Slay, La'Toyia)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Dollarhide on behalf of Capital One National Association (Dollarhide, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant, Bank of America, N.A., shall respond to the complaint not later than November 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/9/20. (def)
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Capital One National Association. (Beckett, Patrick)
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George D. Hembree, III on behalf of Synchrony Financial (Hembree, George)
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Synchrony Financial waiver sent on 9/9/2020. (Hembree, George)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by American Express Company. (Keup, Morgan) Modified on 10/13/2020 (jla).
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bentley, Stephanie)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George D. Hembree, III on behalf of TD Auto Finance LLC (Hembree, George)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; TD Auto Finance LLC waiver sent on 9/28/2020. (Hembree, George)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 The Huntington National Bank's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ashley Mosby by Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Burton, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC. (Parrott, Evan)
October 2, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)2 and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (jla)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ashley Mosby by FedEx Employees Credit Association Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Robinson, Brittan)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer due 11/14/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/1/20. (def) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jla).
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Windsor Burton on behalf of Huntington National Bank (Burton, Elizabeth)
October 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer due 11/14/2020. (jla)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Huntington National Bank waiver sent on 9/10/2020. (Burton, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued, (Wells Fargo Bank, National Association) Acknowledgment filed by Ashley Mosby. (Hopson, Derek)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Bey, Sheryl)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheryl Bey on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Bey, Sheryl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Derek D. Hopson on behalf of Ashley Mosby of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Unifi Equipment Finance (Hopson, Derek)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, American Express Company, Bank of America Corporation, Capital One National Association, Carmax Business Services, LLC, Fedex Exmployees Credit Union, Huntington National Bank, Jehlani King, Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC, Synchrony Financial, TD Auto Finance LLC, Trantor Management, Inc., Unifi Equipment Finance, Wayfair, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1843084, filed by Ashley Mosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Return Check, #2 Exhibit B - Contract For Vehicles, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosby v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Auto Finance LLC formerly known as DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge doing business as ReMarketing Edge
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jehlani King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon I. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Elizabeth Windsor Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association formerly known as Wells Fargo Dealer Services doing business as Wells Fargo Auto
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Exmployees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cingular Wireless Employee Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon I. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Morgan McPhail Keup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okpala Manneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaimlerChrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, Chrysler Financial Services Americas LLC, InLaneEdge, ReMarketingEdge
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Represented By: La'Toyia Jenessa Slay
Represented By: Patrick Ryan Beckett
Represented By: John Dollarhide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trantor Management, Inc. doing business as Trantor Atlantic Lofts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Represented By: George D. Hembree, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Individuals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCFS USA LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Bumgarner
Represented By: Evan Nicholas Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Bancshares Incorporated
Represented By: Elizabeth Windsor Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Represented By: Sheryl Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Business Services, LLC doing business as CarMax Auto Finance
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayfair, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifi Equipment Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Stephanie J. Bentley
Represented By: Stephen T. Masley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Brittan Webb Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Bumgarner
Represented By: Evan Nicholas Parrott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: FedEx Employees Credit Association Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Brittan Webb Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ashley Mosby
Represented By: Derek D. Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?