Cason v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janice Cason
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00151
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/6/2020. (jf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Hicks, Jenessa)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Janice Cason. (jwr)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Sunflower County, Mississippi, case number 2020-0309. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1844339) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
August 26, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cason v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Represented By: Jenessa Carter Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Cason
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?