Walker v. Caldwell et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Walker
Defendant: Jonathan Upp, Bennie Milton, Shabridget Caldwell, Regina Strong, MedStat EMS, Inc., John Does 1-5, Andrew Walda and The City of Indianola, Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2020cv00156
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has 14 additional days form the original answer date in which to answer or file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/26/20. (JMV)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Jonathan Upp and Andrew Walda (jla)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bennie Milton, Regina Simpson. (Griffith, Mary)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Bennie Milton, Regina Simpson (Griffith, Mary)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Bennie Milton, Regina Simpson (Griffith, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Defend by MedStat EMS, Inc.. (Julian, Thomas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda C. Cooper on behalf of Marcus Walker Regina Simpson served on 10/20/2020. (Cooper, Rhonda)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda C. Cooper on behalf of Marcus Walker Bennie Milton served on 10/16/2020. (Cooper, Rhonda)
October 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda C. Cooper on behalf of Marcus Walker Shabridget Caldwell served on 9/29/2020. (Cooper, Rhonda)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda C. Cooper on behalf of Marcus Walker The City of Indianola, Mississippi served on 9/29/2020. (Cooper, Rhonda)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda C. Cooper on behalf of Marcus Walker MedStat EMS, Inc. served on 9/30/2020. (Cooper, Rhonda)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/20/2020. (irw)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Shabridget Caldwell, The City of Indianola, Mississippi. (Griffith, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary McKay Griffith on behalf of Shabridget Caldwell, The City of Indianola, Mississippi (Griffith, Mary)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Shabridget Caldwell, The City of Indianola, Mississippi (Griffith, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Reissued as to Regina Strong (Regina Simpson); emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Shabridget Caldwell, MedStat EMS, Inc., Bennie Milton, Regina Strong, The City of Indianola, Mississippi, Jonathan Upp, Andrew Walda; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
September 8, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1847365, filed by Marcus Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Caldwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Upp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie Milton
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shabridget Caldwell
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regina Strong
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedStat EMS, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Walda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Indianola, Mississippi
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Mary McKay Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Walker
Represented By: Rhonda C. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?