Wilson v. Washington County
Petitioner: Hakeem Wilson
Respondent: Washington County
Case Number: 4:2020cv00158
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER GRANTING re #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma and DIRECTING State to Respond filed by Hakeem Wilson. (cb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #5 Order, Set Deadlines, Terminate Motions, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Acknowledgment filed by Washington County. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING re #3 MOTION to Proceed in forma and DIRECTING State to Respond filed by Hakeem Wilson. Washington County answer due 11/22/2020. Motions terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 9/8/2020. (cb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hakeem Wilson. (cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Washington County), filed by Hakeem Wilson. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Washington County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washington County
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hakeem Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?