Jefferson v. City of Greenville, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Tyrice Jefferson
Defendant: Officer Jay Burden, John Does 1-5, City of Greenville, Mississippi, Officer Tommy Harris and Officer Alfred Brasfield
Case Number: 4:2020cv00209
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 10:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 2/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/4/2021. (jf)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Alfred Brasfield, Jay Burden, City of Greenville, Mississippi, Tommy Harris. (Marsh, Jason)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Jay Burden waiver sent on 12/7/2020. (Marsh, Jason)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Alfred Brasfield waiver sent on 12/7/2020. (Marsh, Jason)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Tommy Harris waiver sent on 12/7/2020. (Marsh, Jason)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, City of Greenville, Mississippi answer due 1/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/11/2020. (def)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clerk's Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - City of Greenville, Summons, Return, #5 Exhibit E - Jay Burden Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Tommy Harris Summons, #7 Exhibit G - Alfred Brasfield Summons) (Marsh, Jason)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court (UNOPPOSED) by City of Greenville, Mississippi. (Marsh, Jason)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/7/20. (jla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tyrice Jefferson. (jla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tommy Harris, Alfred Brasfield, City of Greenville, Mississippi, Jay Burden from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 2020-0131 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1882465) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Tommy Harris, Alfred Brasfield, City of Greenville, Mississippi, Jay Burden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
December 7, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson v. City of Greenville, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jay Burden
Represented By: Jason Thomas Marsh
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greenville, Mississippi
Represented By: Jason Thomas Marsh
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tommy Harris
Represented By: Jason Thomas Marsh
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alfred Brasfield
Represented By: Jason Thomas Marsh
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrice Jefferson
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?