Abraham v. Abraham Development Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: George Douglas Abraham
Defendant: Leila W. Abraham, Joyce A. Buttross, Robert N. Warrington, The Gerald L. Abraham Family Trust, Abraham Development Company, LLC, Dawn Guessford Miller, Leesa Gwin Cumbaa and Wayne K. Guessford, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00215
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Leila W. Abraham, Abraham Development Company, LLC, Joyce A. Buttross, Leesa Gwin Cumbaa, Wayne K. Guessford, Jr, Dawn Guessford Miller, The Gerald L. Abraham Family Trust. (Ray, William)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William F. Ray on behalf of Leila W. Abraham, Abraham Development Company, LLC, Joyce A. Buttross, Leesa Gwin Cumbaa, Wayne K. Guessford, Jr, Dawn Guessford Miller, The Gerald L. Abraham Family Trust (Ray, William)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Wayne K. Guessford, Jr waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; The Gerald L. Abraham Family Trust waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Leila W. Abraham waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Leesa Gwin Cumbaa waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Joyce A. Buttross waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Dawn Guessford Miller waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Abraham Development Company, LLC waiver sent on 12/18/2020. (Harris, Andrew)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan on behalf of Robert N. Warrington (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Robert N. Warrington waiver sent on 1/6/2021. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney by email for service. (jwr)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1886329, filed by George Douglas Abraham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jan. 5, 2018 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
December 15, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham v. Abraham Development Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leila W. Abraham
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce A. Buttross
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert N. Warrington
Represented By: Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gerald L. Abraham Family Trust
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Development Company, LLC
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Guessford Miller
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leesa Gwin Cumbaa
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne K. Guessford, Jr.
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Douglas Abraham
Represented By: Andrew Scott Harris
Represented By: Lisa Anderson Reppeto
Represented By: Lisa A. Reppeto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?