Johnson v. Clarksdale Municipal School District et al
Plaintiff: Chachi Johnson
Defendant: Teresa Mackey, Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dennis Dupree and Napoleon Brewer
Case Number: 4:2021cv00006
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Teresa Mackey served on 2/23/2021. (jwr) Modified on 3/19/2021 (jwr).
March 18, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Napoleon Brewster, Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dr. Earl Joe Nelson, successor to Dennis Dupree. (jwr) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/19/2021) (jwr).
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/18/21. (cs)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Palmer, Carlos)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Napoleon Brewer, Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dennis Dupree, Teresa Mackey. (Palmer, Carlos)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos Diallo Palmer on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer, Carlos)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jwr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Napoleon Brewer, Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dennis Dupree, Teresa Mackey; forwarded to US Marshal for service. (jla)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/5/21. (cs)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chachi Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form AO 240) (jla)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chachi Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Clarksdale Municipal School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chachi Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Mackey
Represented By: Carlos Diallo Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksdale Municipal School District
Represented By: Carlos Diallo Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Dupree
Represented By: Carlos Diallo Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napoleon Brewer
Represented By: Carlos Diallo Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?