Appel et al v. Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Appel and Christopher Boshoff
Defendant: Kyle Mills and Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00037
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC, Kyle Mills. (Lee, Jamie)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bethany A. Tarpley on behalf of All Defendants (Tarpley, Bethany)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Ferguson Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Jamie)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC, and Kyle Mills. (jla)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melia Amal Bouhabib on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bouhabib, Melia)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Huang on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Huang, David) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened pdf version of same on 4/7/2021) (jla).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney David Huang. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/31/2021. (ck)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Melia Amal Bouhabib. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/31/2021. (ck)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney David Huang,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925667) by Dennis Appel, Christopher Boshoff. (McDuff, Robert) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened pdf on 3/29/2021) (jwr).
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Amal Bouhabib,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1925663) by Dennis Appel, Christopher Boshoff. (McDuff, Robert) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/29/2021 with flattened .pdf) (jwr).
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert B. McDuff on behalf of Dennis Appel, Christopher Boshoff All Defendants served 3/26/2021 (McDuff, Robert) Modified on 3/26/2021 (tab).
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Mandatory ECF Registration: Joseph Reilly Morse (tab)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mandatory ECF Registration: Amelia S. McGowan (tab)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC, Kyle Mills. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1924906, filed by Dennis Appel, Christopher Boshoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Clearance Order, #2 Exhibit B Summary of Terms of Employment) (tab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2021: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab).
March 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Appel et al v. Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Appel
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Amelia S. McGowan
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: David Huang
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Boshoff
Represented By: Joseph Reilly Morse
Represented By: Amelia S. McGowan
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: David Huang
Represented By: Melia Amal Bouhabib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Mills
Represented By: Jamie Ferguson Lee
Represented By: Bethany A. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Mills Trucking & Custom Harvesting, LLC
Represented By: Jamie Ferguson Lee
Represented By: Bethany A. Tarpley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?