Johnson v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cary Johnson
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company doing business as GEICO
Case Number: 4:2021cv00057
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 Response in Opposition to #12 Motion filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Frankel, Brittany) Modified on 6/25/2021 to link to motion(jwr).
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Frankel, Brittany)
June 17, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2021 02:30 PM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (jla)
June 16, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Hathaway, Bradley) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jwr).
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephone Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2021 02:30 PM in Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Counsel to call court conference line at 877-336-1839, Access Code 6893215. CMO and CSMs due not later than July 26, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/15/21. (def) Modified on 6/17/2021 (jla).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2021 at 11:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Joint Case Management Order and the parties' Confidential Settlement Memos are due no later than 7/26/2021. *** PLEASE READ THE INITIAL ORDER CAREFULLY AS IT CONTAINS IMPORTANT INFORMATION REGARDING THE SUBMISSION OF THE PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMOS ***. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/14/2021. (jf)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Cary Johnson. (Hemphill, Gregory)
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Cary Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hemphill, Gregory)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 Response in Opposition to #7 Motion FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL filed by Cary Johnson. (Hemphill, Gregory) Modified on 6/10/2021 to link to motion (jwr).
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cary Johnson. (Hemphill, Gregory)
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Hathaway, Bradley)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Hathaway, Bradley)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hathaway, Bradley)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Bradley Farel Hathaway on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum upon Cellular South, Inc., d/b/a C Spire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Hathaway, Bradley) Modified on 5/17/2021 (jla).
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Hathaway, Bradley)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Receipt) (Hathaway, Bradley)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Case Filing as to Gregory Ladd Hemphill (jla)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against GEICO General Insurance Company, filed by Cary Johnson. (jla)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 2021-0025CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1942093) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. GEICO General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company doing business as GEICO
Represented By: Bradley Farel Hathaway
Represented By: Brittany Brooks Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Johnson
Represented By: Gregory Ladd Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?