Justice v. Mound Bayou Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Jason Justice
Defendant: Mound Bayou Housing Authority
Case Number: 4:2021cv00078
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mound Bayou Housing Authority. (Chambers, Rayford)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rayford G. Chambers on behalf of Mound Bayou Housing Authority (Chambers, Rayford)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H. Watson, Jr on behalf of Jason Justice Mound Bayou Housing Authority served on 6/18/2021. (Watson, Louis)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Jason Justice (Norris, Robert)
June 9, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mound Bayou Housing Authority. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1956920, filed by Jason Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. Mound Bayou Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mound Bayou Housing Authority
Represented By: Rayford G. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Justice
Represented By: Louis H. Watson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert N. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?