Bailey v. Kennedy et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Bailey
Defendant: James M. Kennedy, John Does One Through Five and CRST International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00089
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Michael Crawley Steele on behalf of Leroy Bailey to James M. Kennedy. (Steele, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 9/17/2021 as to #10 Summons Issued, Summons Reissued Acknowledgment filed by CRST International, Inc. (tab)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/22/2021. (irw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due seven (7) business days prior to the conference. (irw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 at 09:30 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 5/9/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/9/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/10/2022. Motions due by 7/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/22/2021. (irw)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Crawley Steele on behalf of Leroy Bailey CRST International, Inc. served on 9/14/2021. (Steele, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to CSRT International, Inc. (jla)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jla)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 9/9/2021. Parties consent to trial by Magistrate Judge. (irw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Berry, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to CRST International, Inc., Summons Reissued as to James M. Kennedy. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by James M. Kennedy; (filed in state court, see Doc #3 ). (jla)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CRST International, Inc, Jury Demand, filed by Leroy Bailey. (Steele, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/2021. (jtm)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/2021. (irw)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court by Leroy Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Steele, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE of James M. Kennedy's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions by Michael Garner Berry, I on behalf of James M. Kennedy to Plaintiff. (Berry, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons, #4 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Returned Receipt Card, #6 Exhibit 7 - Answer and Defenses of James M. Kennedy, #7 Exhibit 8 - James M. Kennedy's Notice of Service of Discovery, #8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Discovery, #9 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Discovery, #10 Exhibit 11 - James M. Kennedy's Notice of Service of Discovery, #11 Exhibit 12 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Berry, Michael)
August 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Does One Through Five, James M. Kennedy, filed by Leroy Bailey. (jla)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by James M. Kennedy from County Court of Washington County, case number 2021-0132CO. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1979751) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by James M. Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Kennedy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Bailey
Represented By: Michael C. Steele
Represented By: Michael Crawley Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Kennedy
Represented By: Michael Garner Berry, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does One Through Five
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Garner Berry, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?