Hays v. Cain
Petitioner: Howard Hays
Respondent: Burl Cain
Case Number: 4:2021cv00092
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Greenville Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Remark: Successive Habeas opened at USCA as Case No.: 21-60677. (cb)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring petition to U.S. Court of Appeals - 5th Circuit to determine if petitioner is allowed to file successive habeas petition in this court. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/23/21. (cb)
August 10, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MSN300027986 (cb)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring the Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis request including inmate account information within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/4/21. (cb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Virden. (cb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document submitted electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K) (cb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Leflore County) filed by Howard Hays. Document submitted electronically (cb) Modified on 8/4/2021 (cb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Howard Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?