James v. Sunflower County Sheriff et al
Petitioner: Crandall James
Respondent: Sunflower County Sheriff and State of Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2021cv00097
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Crandall James. (cb)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Pro Se Address by Crandall James. (cb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Amended / Supplement to Document, #7 Amended / Supplement to Document, #5 Amended / Supplement to Document, #8 Order, Set Deadlines, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Acknowledgment filed by State of Mississippi, Sunflower County Sheriff. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing State to Respond. State of Mississippi answer due 11/14/2021; Sunflower County Sheriff answer due 11/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/31/21. (cb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #3 ORDER Requiring Petitioner to Submit an Amended Petition on the Proper Form; also Requiring Petitioner to Either Pay the Filing Fee or Submit a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days. (cb)
August 25, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number MSN300028032 (tab)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cb)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cb)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Petitioner to Submit an Amended Petition on the Proper Form; also Requiring Petitioner to Either Pay the Filing Fee or Submit a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 21 days re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Crandall James. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/16/21. (cb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Sunflower County), filed by Crandall James. (cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Sunflower County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crandall James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunflower County Sheriff
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?