Ferretti v. DeJoy
Plaintiff: Katherine Ferretti and Kathrine Ferretti
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 4:2021cv00099
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Kucia on behalf of Kathrine Ferretti Louis DeJoy served on 9/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Service on Attorney General, #2 Service on U.S. Attorney, #3 Service on Postmaster General) (Kucia, Jay)
September 24, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed; Attorney refiled, see Doc #7 (jla)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Kucia on behalf of Kathrine Ferretti (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement Letter) (Kucia, Jay)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Louis DeJoy (for service upon Attorney General and US Attorney) (jla)
September 23, 2021 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: Please refile summons return to include copy of certified mail return card. (jla)
September 16, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to USA: Please refile summons return to include copy of certified mail return card. (jwr)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay Kucia on behalf of Kathrine Ferretti Louis DeJoy served on 9/7/2021. (Kucia, Jay)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process Re: Louis DeJoy (tab)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Louis DeJoy. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1985892, filed by Katherine Ferretti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
August 16, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferretti v. DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Ferretti
Represented By: Joel Frank Dillard
Represented By: Jay Kucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathrine Ferretti
Represented By: Joel Frank Dillard
Represented By: Jay Kucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?