Brandon v. The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carrie Brandon
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. and Kenan Transport, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00107
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Keishunna R. Webster on behalf of Kenan Transport, LLC to Plaintiff. (Webster, Keishunna)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/18/2021. (irw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial-Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) business days prior to the conference. (irw)
October 18, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (jtm)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 4/13/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/13/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/14/2022. Daubert Motions due by 5/13/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/14/2021. (irw)
October 13, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/13/2021. (irw)
October 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure by Nicholas Alexander Puckett on behalf of Carrie Brandon to Kenan Transport, LLC. (Puckett, Nicholas)
October 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Meade Westmoreland Mitchell on behalf of Kenan Transport, LLC to Plaintiff. (Mitchell, Meade)
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Kenan Transport, LLC. (Mitchell, Meade)
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Kenan Transport, LLC. (Mitchell, Meade)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenan Transport, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by Carrie Brandon. (Puckett, Nicholas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER rescinding #9 ORDER; granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/27/21. (jla)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/24/21. (jla)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #7 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court Revised Amended Complaint. (Puckett, Nicholas)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint - State Court by Carrie Brandon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint) (Puckett, Nicholas) Modified on 9/27/2021 (jla).
September 10, 2021 NOTICE cancelling Case Management Conference re #5 Initial Order - Rule 16.1. (irw)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Alexander Puckett on behalf of Carrie Brandon (Puckett, Nicholas)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/27/21. (irw)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons to The Kenan Advantage Group, #3 Notice of Service of Discovery, #4 Affidavit of Process Server) (Webster, Keishunna)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.. (Webster, Keishunna)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc., filed by Carrie Brandon. (jla)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc. from Coahoma County Circuit Court, case number 14CI 1:21cv30. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1990252) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - Settlement Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Brandon
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Represented By: Nicholas Alexander Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keishunna R. Webster
Represented By: Meade Westmoreland Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenan Transport, LLC
Represented By: Keishunna R. Webster
Represented By: Meade Westmoreland Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?