Strait v. City of Rosedale, Mississippi
Plaintiff: James Strait
Defendant: City of Rosedale, Mississippi
Case Number: 4:2021cv00114
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; City of Rosedale, Mississippi waiver sent on 9/23/2021. (Waide, Jim)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendant, c/o Todd Butler, Esq. (by request) on 9/23/2021 by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of James Strait. Waiver of Service due by 10/25/2021. (Waide, Jim)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Rosedale, Mississippi; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1997370, filed by James Strait. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strait v. City of Rosedale, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Strait
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rosedale, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?