Chamberlain et al v. Baxter et al
Plaintiff: Michael Chamberlain and Tonya Chamberlain
Defendant: Maxley B. Baxter, David L. Hoglund, Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc., JC Rentals, Inc., Charles Marter, Patricia Richardson and John/Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2021cv00170
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: #17 Case Management Conference held on 2/15/2022. (irw)
February 15, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information is provided on the notice. (irw)
February 14, 2022 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION to Stay Civil Action filed by Maxley B. Baxter. (Whitehead, William)
February 14, 2022 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Civil Action by Maxley B. Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indictment, #2 Exhibit B - Court's Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Motion for Discovery, #4 Exhibit D - Motion for Continuance, #5 Exhibit E - Order of Continuance) (Whitehead, William)
February 2, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Kevin Horan on behalf of Patricia Richardson (Horan, M.)
February 2, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Kevin Horan on behalf of Charles Marter (Horan, M.)
January 31, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by David L. Hoglund. (Atkins, Jay)
January 28, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Maxley B. Baxter. (Whitehead, William)
January 25, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Marshall Atkins on behalf of David L. Hoglund (Atkins, Jay)
January 19, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc., JC Rentals, Inc., Charles Marter, Patricia Richardson. (Dambrino, Robert)
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of Conference: #17 Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
January 13, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Peyton Randolph, II on behalf of Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain Maxley B. Baxter served on 1/10/2022. (Randolph, John)
January 12, 2022 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michael Jones (Doc 308 , 309 ) (jla)
January 12, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #18 Mail Returned; DISREGARD ENTRY, filed in wrong case. (jla)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/10/22. (irw)
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc., JC Rentals, Inc., Charles Marter, Patricia Richardson. (Dambrino, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Reissued as to Maxley B. Baxter, Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc., David L. Hoglund, JC Rentals, Inc., Charles Marter, Patricia Richardson; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
January 6, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST] against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Uniform Crash Report, #2 Summons Maxley Baxter, #3 Summons David L. Hoglund, #4 Summons Dry Dock Bar & Grill, #5 Summons JC Rentals, #6 Summons Charles Marter, #7 Summons Patricia Richardson) (Randolph, John)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/6/22. (sko)
December 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Dambrino, III on behalf of Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc., JC Rentals, Inc., Charles Marter, Patricia Richardson (Dambrino, Robert)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Peyton Randolph, II on behalf of Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain Patricia Richardson served on 12/21/2021. (Randolph, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Peyton Randolph, II on behalf of Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain Charles Marter served on 12/21/2021. (Randolph, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Peyton Randolph, II on behalf of Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain JC Rentals, Inc. served on 12/21/2021. (Randolph, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Peyton Randolph, II on behalf of Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc. served on 12/21/2021. (Randolph, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint / Redacted Uniform Crash Report) (Randolph, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dry Dock SOS Info, #2 Exhibit 2 - JC Rentals SOS Info) (Randolph, John)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO JURISDICTION. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/22/21. (sko)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick Duane Patt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Patt, Rick)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Filing as to Rick D. Patt (jwr)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
December 21, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2040669, filed by Michael Chamberlain, Tonya Chamberlain. (Attachments: #1 ) Exhibit A - Uniform Crash Report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chamberlain et al v. Baxter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chamberlain
Represented By: John Peyton Randolph, II
Represented By: Rick Duane Patt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Chamberlain
Represented By: John Peyton Randolph, II
Represented By: Rick Duane Patt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxley B. Baxter
Represented By: William Arthur Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Hoglund
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dry Dock Bar & Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Marter
Represented By: M. Kevin Horan
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Richardson
Represented By: M. Kevin Horan
Represented By: Robert J. Dambrino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?