Moore v. Clarksdale Municipal School District et al
Plaintiff: Lashea Moore
Defendant: Clarksdale Municipal School District, The City of Clarksdale, MS, Superintendent Dr. Earl Joe Nelson, Police Chief Sandra Williams, School Resource Off. Derrell Washington, The Estate of Police Officer Kendrick Walker and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2022cv00042
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The City of Clarksdale, MS. (Allen, R.)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 6/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/18/22. (irw)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Monell, Fourth Amendment, Eighth Amendment, and State Law Claims filed by Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dr. Earl Joe Nelson. (Hargett, Candice)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Monell, Fourth Amendment, Eighth Amendment, and State Law Claims by Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dr. Earl Joe Nelson. (Hargett, Candice)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dr. Earl Joe Nelson. (Hargett, Candice)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cody Hallmark on behalf of The City of Clarksdale, MS (Hallmark, John)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of The City of Clarksdale, MS (Allen, R.)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Clarksdale Municipal School District, The City of Clarksdale, MS, Superintendent Dr. Earl Joe Nelson, Police Chief Sandra Williams, and The Estate of Police Officer Kendrick Walker (jla)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Clarksdale Municipal School District, Dr. Earl Joe Nelson, The City of Clarksdale, MS, The Estate of Police Officer Kendrick Walker, Derrell Washington, Sandra Williams. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMSNDC-2075455, filed by Lashea Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Clarksdale Municipal School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashea Moore
Represented By: TreMarcus D. Rosemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarksdale Municipal School District
Represented By: Candice C. Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Clarksdale, MS
Represented By: John Cody Hallmark
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Dr. Earl Joe Nelson
Represented By: Candice C. Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Chief Sandra Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Resource Off. Derrell Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Police Officer Kendrick Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?