Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC v. FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC
Defendant: FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00080
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. FQS Bear Equipment, Inc's Designation of Experts (Forks, Joseph) Modified on 5/31/2023 (jwr).
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/18/23. (cs)
April 28, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Designation of Experts by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC to FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Kidd, D.)
April 7, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE by Grant M. Tarleton on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SDT to AFEX Fire Suppression System) (Tarleton, Grant)
April 7, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Grant M. Tarleton on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC (Tarleton, Grant)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER Extending Case Management Deadlines: Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 4/28/2023. Defendant's Designation of Experts due by 5/29/2023. Discovery due by 6/15/2023. Motions due by 6/30/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/20/23. (No document attached.) (cs)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY Amended CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/27/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/28/2023. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/13/23. No document attached. (def)
February 15, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE to Take Deposition of William Ring by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC (Kidd, D.)
February 7, 2023 Filing 30 Objection to #28 Notice to Take Deposition DEPOSITION TOPICS. (Forks, Joseph)
February 7, 2023 Filing 29 STIPULATION re #28 Notice to Take Deposition AS TO NONWAIVER OF OBJECTIONS by FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Forks, Joseph)
February 6, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE to Take Deposition of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. 30(b)(6) by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC (Kidd, D.)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING Ore Tenus Motion to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 3/13/2023. Defendant's Designation of Experts due by 4/14/2023. Discovery due by 5/15/2023. Motions due by 5/31/2023. No further order will issue. No document attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/19/23. (cs)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend #11 Case Management Order. Plaintiff's Designation of Experts due by 2/13/2023. Defendant's Designation of Experts due by 3/13/2023. Discovery due by 4/14/2023. Motions due by 4/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/29/22. No document attached. (cs)
December 28, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Case Management Order,, Unopposed by Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC. (Kidd, D.)
December 1, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Forks, Joseph)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/1/22. (cs)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend CMO. Motions for Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/15/22. No document attached. (cs)
November 10, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 Case Management Order,, Unopposed by Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC. (Kidd, D.) Modified on 11/13/2022 (jla).
November 3, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference set for November 4, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in the Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers. (def)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Governing Final Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/19/2022. (jf)
October 19, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Draft of Final Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2023. (jf)
October 10, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Waste Connections' First Request for Production of Documents by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC to FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Kidd, D.)
October 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Waste Connections' First Set of Interrogatories by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC to FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Kidd, D.)
September 13, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. (Forks, Joseph)
September 13, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Edward Thomas by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. (Forks, Joseph)
September 1, 2022 TEXT ONLY NOTICE resetting Conference: Settlement Conference reset for 11/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. No document attached. (cs)
August 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by D. Sterling Kidd on behalf of Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC to FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Kidd, D.)
August 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Discovery due by 3/10/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/10/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/13/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/10/2023. Motions due by 3/24/2023. Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Oxford Visiting Magistrate Judge Chambers before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 8/11/2022. (jf)
August 8, 2022 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/8/2022. Case Management Order to be entered. (jf)
July 22, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Forks, Joseph)
July 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Forks, Joseph)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2022 at 10:30 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 8/1/2022. PLEASE READ THE INITIAL ORDER CAREFULLY AS HIGHLIGHTED PORTIONS RELATE TO NEW LOCAL RULES AND A NEW CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FORM. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/14/2022. (jf)
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #3 Summons State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit State Court Return of Summons Executed) (Forks, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Forks, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Forks, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F. Stacy, Jr on behalf of FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. (Stacy, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against FQS Bear Equipment, Inc., filed by Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC. (jla)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FQS Bear Equipment, Inc. from Leflore County Circuit Court, case number 2022-0024-CICI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2101281) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - FQS Annual Report, #3 Exhibit C - Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services Annual Report, #4 Exhibit D - Waste Connections of Mississippi Annual Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
May 27, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC v. FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waste Connections of Mississippi Disposal Services, LLC
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Grant M. Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FQS Bear Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?