Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC doing business as Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge and Trevina McGee
Case Number: 4:2022cv00129
Filed: August 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian L. Yoakum on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Trevina McGee served on 8/24/2022. (Yoakum, Brian)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 10/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/15/2022. (irw)
September 15, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Defenses by Trevina McGee, Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC. (Griffin, Willie)
September 12, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willie Griffin on behalf of Trevina McGee, Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC (Griffin, Willie)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Brian L. Yoakum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 08/19/2022. (nih)
August 16, 2022 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Brian L. Yoakum,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130489) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Getz, Joseph)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Brian L. Yoakum,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2130489) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Getz, Joseph)
August 16, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Brian L. Yoakum; Attorney to refile motion with handwritten signature of applicant as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4)(K). Please use the civil event Exhibits to Other Document and link to the original motion. (jla)
August 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trevina McGee, Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2129154, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 11, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Represented By: Brian L. Yoakum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge LLC doing business as Ventura's Restaurant & Lounge
Represented By: Willie Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevina McGee
Represented By: Willie Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?