Labuzan-Delane v. Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennine Labuzan-Delane
Defendant: Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc., Cochran Farms Inc., Lakeland Farms LLC, Greenlee Family LLC, Jennings Farms LLC and David T. Cochran
Case Number: 4:2022cv00149
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Jennine Labuzan-Delane. (jwr)
November 17, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jennine Labuzan-Delane. (jwr)
November 17, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #19 Response in Support of Motion. All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (cb)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to file response re #15 Response to Motion; deferring ruling on #17 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/16/2022. (jtm)
November 15, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Support re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Greenlee Family LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Book N Page 275 Certified, #2 Exhibit B - Book F Page 417 Certified, #3 Exhibit C - Book L Page 233 Certified) (Tyrone, James) Modified on 11/17/2022 (cb).
November 15, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Sanctions by Greenlee Family LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2022-10-14 Ltr to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit B - 2022-10-24 Ltr to Plaintiff) (Tyrone, James)
November 15, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike ,or Alternatively, MOTION for Extension of Time by Lakeland Farms LLC. (Phillips, Paul)
November 14, 2022 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM In Support of #22 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Jennine Labuzan-Delane. (jla) Modified on 11/18/2022 (jwr).
October 27, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jennine Labuzan-Delane by Lakeland Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Phillips, Paul)
October 27, 2022 Filing 13 Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc., Cochran Farms Inc., Lakeland Farms LLC, Greenlee Family LLC, and Jennings Farms LLC, (jla) Modified on 10/27/2022 (jla).
October 24, 2022 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Greenlee Family LLC. (Tyrone, James)
October 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Greenlee Family LLC. (Tyrone, James)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer; answer due within 15 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/18/22. (jla)
October 15, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David T. Cochran, Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc., Cochran Farms Inc., Jennings Farms LLC. (Cookston, Steven)
October 14, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jennine Labuzan-Delane by Greenlee Family LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Shipping Label, #2 Exhibit B - Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Greenlee Family LLC-Morgan WD, #4 Exhibit D - Tavenner Deed) (Tyrone, James) Modified on 10/18/2022 (jla).
October 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lakeland Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips, Paul) Modified on 10/18/2022 (jla).
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Scott Phillips on behalf of Lakeland Farms LLC (Phillips, Paul)
October 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Matthew Tyrone on behalf of Greenlee Family LLC (Tyrone, James)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc. served on 9/23/2022; Cochran Farms Inc. served on 9/23/2022; Greenlee Family LLC served on 9/23/2022; Jennings Farms LLC served on 9/23/2022; Lakeland Farms LLC served on 9/23/2022. (jla)
September 23, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to plaintiff for service. (jwr)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 329207, filed by Jennine Labuzan-Delane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labuzan-Delane v. Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennine Labuzan-Delane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochran & Cochran Land Co., Inc.
Represented By: Steven Cavitt Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochran Farms Inc.
Represented By: Steven Cavitt Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Farms LLC
Represented By: Paul Scott Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenlee Family LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Tyrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Farms LLC
Represented By: Steven Cavitt Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David T. Cochran
Represented By: Steven Cavitt Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?