Jones v. Stamps et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Jones
Defendant: Anita Stamps and Larry Stamps
Case Number: 4:2024cv00056
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Larry Stamps (jla)
July 18, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anita Stamps. (Stamps, Anita)
July 18, 2024 Filing 12 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anita Stamps. (Stamps, Anita)
July 17, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 Memorandum in SupporT: Attorney directed to refile motion and memorandum brief as separate documents as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and 7(b)(4). L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2)(B) states that a motion may not exceed four pages and may not contain legal argument or citations to case law or other secondary authority. Motion has been terminated. (lgm)
July 16, 2024 Filing 11 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anita Stamps. (Stamps, Anita) Modified on 7/25/2024 (jla).
July 16, 2024 Filing 10 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Anita Stamps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Stamps, Anita) Modified on 7/17/2024 (lgm).
July 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by Anita Mathews Stamps on behalf of Anita Stamps (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Returned Envelope) (Stamps, Anita)
July 11, 2024 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Herbert Jones re Doc #3 . (rcm)
July 9, 2024 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Clerk Certification, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Summons for Larry Stamps, #5 State Court Summons for Anita Stamps, #6 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court Proof of Service for Anita Stamps, #8 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Stamps, Anita)
July 8, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 State Court Record - Removal: Attorney directed to refile state court record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in the red docket text of Docket Entry #1 . (lgm)
July 3, 2024 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record) (Stamps, Anita)
July 3, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 State Court Record - Removal : Attorney directed to (re)file state court record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in the red docket text of Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
July 2, 2024 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Stamps, Anita)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Anita Stamps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Stamps, Anita)
June 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
June 21, 2024 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Herbert Jones. (jwr)
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anita Stamps from Circuit Court of Sunflower County, Mississippi, case number 2024-0157. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSNDC-2404580) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Anita Stamps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Stamps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Stamps
Represented By: Anita Mathews Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?