McCaskill v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Willie J. McCaskill
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2024cv00118
Filed: December 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2025 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 2/19/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/27/2025. (irw)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company. (Radicioni, Cory)
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (zdg)
January 8, 2025 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Allstate Insurance Company. (zdg)
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2466944, filed by Willie J. McCaskill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zdg)
December 2, 2024 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (zdg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaskill v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. McCaskill
Represented By: William Noel Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?