Bass v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kenya Denise Bass
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2025cv00007
Filed: January 17, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2025 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jla)
March 14, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Social Security Hearing set for 8/12/2025 at 11:00 AM in Greenville Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Concerning Consent to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/14/2025. (Attachment: #1 Consent) (irw)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Filing of Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/14/2025. (irw)
March 14, 2025 Filing 5 Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Part 2 of 2) (Davis, Stuart)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/23/2025. (jwr)
January 21, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Davis on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Davis, Stuart)
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenya Denise Bass. (jwr)
January 17, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Kenya Denise Bass. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 17, 2025 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Denise Bass
Represented By: Leanna Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: USA
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?