Butcher et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2006cv00423
Filed: October 14, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting Defendant's 239 Motion to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs. The Court finds that the Plaintiffs are entitled to a recovery of costs in the amount of $16,735.22. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on February 17, 2010 (dsl)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on February 5, 2010 (dsl)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER denying 229 Motion for Relief from Judgment Regarding Prejudgment Interest. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/21/10. (RLW)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Jennifer Butcher, Lawrence K. Butcher against Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/2/09. (RLW)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 221 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. The Court finds that pre-judgment interest on the dwelling claim should be allowed at the rate of 8% per annum, making said pre-judgment in terest on the property damage claim $136,517.82. The Court further finds that the Plaintiffs are entitled to pre-judgment interest on the personal property claim and said interest would be in the amount of $36,708.78. The Court finds that t he emotional distress/mental anguish damages are non-liquidated and pre-judgment interest should not be allowed on said amounts. Additionally, the Court finds that there should be no reduction in the amount of days of interest due as a result of any delays, whether caused by Allstate or Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on October 22, 2009 (dsl)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying Defendants' 106 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Experts. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on February 5, 2009 (dsl)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting in part and denying in part [107/109] Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to the Plaintiffs' Malicious Prosecution, False Arrest and False Imprisonment claims, but is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on February 4, 2009 (dsl)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 102 Motion to Sever or Bifurcate Intervenor's Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on Novemer 26, 2008. (KM)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Protective Order; granting 104 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on November 18, 2008. (KM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?